EP0276801 - Styrene copolymers and process for producing said copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funaki, Keisuke Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuramoto, Masahiko Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishihara, Nobuhide Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101045.8 | 26.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870017973 | 28.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1797387 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276801 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276801 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F12/00 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
C08F12/00 (EP);
C08F212/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Styrol-Copolymere und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1988/31] | English: | Styrene copolymers and process for producing said copolymers | [1988/31] | French: | Copolymères de styrène et procédé pour leur préparation | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3639332 (COOVER HARRY W JR, et al); | [XP]EP0224097 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [XP]EP0210615 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) |