EP0276814 - Object verification system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rand McNally & Company 8255 Central Park Avenue Skokie Illinois 60076 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states Rand McNally & Company 8255 Central Park Avenue Skokie Illinois 60076 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Copella, Robert Allen 1033 Sherman Road Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101110.0 | 26.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | US19870006956 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: US 6956 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276814 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276814 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00, G07F7/08 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
G07F7/086 (EP);
G07D7/004 (EP,US);
G06K19/12 (EP);
G06Q20/347 (EP);
G06Q20/409 (EP);
G07D7/04 (EP,US);
G07D7/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Gegenstandsprüfung | [1988/31] | English: | Object verification system and method | [1988/31] | French: | Système et méthode de vérification d'objets | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/12] | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58091531 ; | [A]US3599153 (LEWIS JERRY, et al); | [A]US3636318 (LINDSTROM GUNNAR, et al); | [A]US4038596 (LEE CYRIL ARTHUR); | [X]EP0204574 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 192 (P-218)(1337) 23 August 1983, & JP-A-58 091 531 (DAINIPPON INSATSU) 31 May 1983, & JP58091531 A 19830531 |