EP0276856 - Trigonometric function preprocessing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasahara, Misayo NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101245.4 | 28.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870019302 | 28.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1930287 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276856 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276856 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276856 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/548 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
G06F1/0353 (EP,US);
G06F7/548 (EP,US);
G06F2101/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/31] | Title | German: | Vorbearbeitungssystem für eine trigonometrische Funktion | [1988/31] | English: | Trigonometric function preprocessing system | [1988/31] | French: | Système de prétraitement d'une fonction trigonométrique | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2544106 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3735110 (LECOMTE C) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPRING JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, Atlantic City, N.J., 5th - 7th May 1970, pages 417,430,431, Afips Press, Montvale, N.J., US; A.S. ZUKIN et al.: "Architecture of a real-time fast fourier radar signal processor" |