EP0276868 - Demodulation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Taketoshi 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101305.6 | 29.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870020303 | 30.01.1987 Original published format: JP 2030387 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276868 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276868 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/14 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
H04L27/1563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Demodulationsschaltung | [1988/31] | English: | Demodulation circuit | [1988/31] | French: | Circuit de démodulation | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/11] | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4447772 (DELONG RONALD V [US]) | [Y] - FREQUENZ, vol. 27, no. 7, July 1973, pages 175-183, Schiele und Schon GmbH, Berlin, DE; W. ZSCHUNKE: "Einige neue Prinzipien für Frequenzdiskriminatoren bei Datenübertragung" |