EP0276871 - Dual port video memory system having a bit-serial address input port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. New Marunouchi Building Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Todd, Christopher J. 1402 South Kitley Avenue Indianapolis Indiana 46203 / US | 02 /
Hirahata, Shigeru c/o Hitachi Ltd., 6,Kanda Surugadai 4 chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/06] |
Former [1988/31] | 01 /
Todd, Christopher J. 1402 South Kitley Avenue Indianapolis Indiana 46203 / US | Representative(s) | von Bezold, Dieter, et al v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | von Bezold, Dieter, Dr., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | von Bezold, Dieter, Dr. Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-8000 München 2 / DE | ||
Former [1988/31] | von Bezold, Dieter, Dr. Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101324.7 | 29.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | US19870008730 | 30.01.1987 Original published format: US 8730 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276871 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276871 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276871 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00, G11C7/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G11C8/16 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (KR);
G11C7/00 (EP,US);
G11C7/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/31] | G11C8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/31] | Title | German: | Video-Doppelzugriffsspeichersystem mit bitseriellem Adresseneingangstor | [1988/31] | English: | Dual port video memory system having a bit-serial address input port | [1988/31] | French: | Système de mémoire vidéo à double accès ayant une porte d'entrée d'adresses de type sériel par bit | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.02.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2817556 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]EP0135940 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [XP]EP0249548 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |