EP0280075 - Optical receiver with polarisation diversity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pietzsch, Joachim, Dr. Waakirchner Strasse 34 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
Noe, Reinhold Sulzbacherstrasse 6 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1988/35] | Application number, filing date | 88101498.9 | 02.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | DE19873706464 | 27.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3706464 | [1988/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280075 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280075 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280075 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/14 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
H04B10/616 (EP);
H04B10/614 (EP);
H04B10/63 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/35] | H04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/35] | Title | German: | Optischer Polarisations-Diversitäts-Empfänger | [1988/35] | English: | Optical receiver with polarisation diversity | [1988/35] | French: | Récepteur optique à diversité de polarisation | [1988/35] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.09.1993 | GB | 02.02.1994 | BE | 28.02.1994 | [1995/11] |
Former [1995/03] | NL | 22.09.1993 | |
GB | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 22.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3431896 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, Band LT-3, Nr. 5, Oktober 1985, Seiten 1110-1122, New York, US; ABBAS et al.: "A Dual-Detector Optical Heterodyne Receiver for Local Oscillator Noise Suppression" | [AD] - ECOC'86, "EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS", Barcelona, SP, 22.-25. September 1986, Seiten 407-410; H. KUWAHARA et al.: "New Receiver Design for Practical Coherent Lightwave Transmission System" | [A] - 4TH ICIO AND OFC, FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION, Tokyo, JP, 27.-30. Juni 1983, Seiten 385-387; T. OKOSHI et al.: "Polarization-Diversity Receiver for Heterodyne/Coherent Optical Fiber Communications" |