EP0278385 - Child's seat for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitt, Michael Schlittweg 1 D-6509 Ober-Flörsheim / DE | [1988/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Quermann, Helmut Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Quermann, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101563.0 | 04.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | DE19873703742 | 07.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3703742 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278385 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278385 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60N1/12, B62B7/12 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
B60N2/2848 (EP);
B60N2/2839 (EP);
B60N2/286 (EP);
B60N2/2875 (EP);
B62B7/12 (EP);
B62B7/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Kindersitz für Fahrzeuge | [1988/33] | English: | Child's seat for vehicles | [1988/33] | French: | Siège d'enfant pour véhicule | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/40] | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.03.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3596986 ; | [A]GB1059237 ; | [A]GB2165745 ; | [A]US3970325 |