EP0280909 - Circuit arrangement for the detection of oscillations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Tiefenklein 2 D-8643 Kueps / DE | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 88101634.9 | 04.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | DE19873704998 | 17.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704998 | [1988/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0280909 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280909 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/02, H04R25/00 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H04R25/453 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/36] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Erkennen von Schwingungen | [1988/36] | English: | Circuit arrangement for the detection of oscillations | [1988/36] | French: | Montage pour la détection d'oscillations | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.10.1991 | IT | 30.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 30.10.1991 | |
IT | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1993/13] | GB | 30.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4091236 (CHEN CHUN-FU); | [AD]FR2370376 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]US4232192 (BEEX ALOYSIUS A) |