EP0278432 - Bridge arm with free-wheel diodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldvoss, Mario, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Senftenauerstrasse 20 D-8000 München 21 / DE | 02 /
Miller, Gerhard, Dr., Ing. Steinacker 3 D-8916 Penzing / DE | 03 /
Porst, Alfred Kurt-Floericke-Strasse 14 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1988/33] | Application number, filing date | 88101707.3 | 05.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | DE19873703660 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3703660 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278432 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278432 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/10, H03K17/08 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
H01L25/18 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K17/0826 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/49113 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49433 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1301 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/49433, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1988/33] | H01L25/14, H03K17/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/33] | Title | German: | Brückenzweig mit Freilaufdioden | [1988/33] | English: | Bridge arm with free-wheel diodes | [1988/33] | French: | Branche de pont avec diodes de roue libre | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0166968 (PILLER GMBH CO KG ANTON [DE]); | [A]US4639823 (KUROKI KAZUO [JP]) | [A] - REVUE GENERALE DE L'ELECTRICITE, Nr. 9, September 1981, Seiten 648-655, Paris, FR; C. GOELDEL et al.: "Utilisation et protection des transistors MOSFET dans la commutation des charges inductives de quelques kilowatts" | [A] - ELEKTRIE, Band 36, Nr. 7, 1982, Seiten 366-370, Berlin, DD; F. FISCHER et al.: "Leistungs-MOSFETs in der Energieelektronik Teil IV und Schluss" | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, Band 29, Nr. 18, September 1981, Seiten 13,16, WASECA, Minnesota, US; W.S. MORDAUNT: "Corrections and protections" |