EP0327651 - Rotating mechanism for a bucket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hinterkopf, Adolf Ringstrasse 17 D-7900 Ulm/Lehr / DE | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101740.4 | 06.02.1988 | [1989/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327651 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01K9/00 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
A01K9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1989/33] | Title | German: | Schwenkvorrichtung für einen Eimer | [1989/33] | English: | Rotating mechanism for a bucket | [1989/33] | French: | Dispositif de pivotement pour un seau | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/40] | 14.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.03.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1403022 ; | [A]AT277652B |