EP0285764 - Device for controlling the amount of brine in the regeneration of ion exchangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CILLIT Wassertechnik GmbH & Co. Bottwarbahnstrasse 70 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states CILLIT WASSERTECHNIK GMBH & CO. Bottwarbahnstrasse 70 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seibel, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eichbrunnenweg 10 D-7101 Hardthausen-Lampoldshausen / DE | 02 /
Weller, Horst Lerchenstrasse 19 D-7101 Neckarsulm / DE | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Eckhard Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101747.9 | 06.02.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19873708669 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3708669 | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0285764 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285764 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01J49/00 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
B01J49/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Solemengeneinstellung bei der Regeneration von Ionenaustauschern | [1988/41] | English: | Device for controlling the amount of brine in the regeneration of ion exchangers | [1988/41] | French: | Installation pour déterminer la quantité de saumure dans la régénération d'échangeurs d'ions | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 15.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.02.1991 | ES | 07.02.1991 | [2004/37] |
Former [1992/29] | AT | 06.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2926746 (BRASWELL JOHN W); | [X]US4421652 (HESKETT DON E [US]) |