EP0279417 - Ester-substituted diaminedithiols and radiolabeled complexes thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY Barley Mill Plaza, Building 25 Wilmington Delaware 19880-0025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY Barley Mill Plaza, Building 25 Wilmington, Delaware 19880-0025 / US | ||
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergstein, Paul Louis 127 Cameron Road Norwood Massachusetts 02062 / US | 02 /
Cheesman, Edward Hollister 1 Birch Lane Townsend Massachusetts 01469 / US | 03 /
Watson, Alan David 11 Summer Street Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102252.9 | 17.02.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | US19870016982 | 18.02.1987 Original published format: US 16982 | US19880143561 | 26.01.1988 Original published format: US 143561 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0279417 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0279417 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279417 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/25, C07C323/26, C07D213/30, A61K41/00, A61K43/00 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C07F13/005 (EP,US);
C07C323/32 (KR);
A61K51/04 (EP,US);
C07C323/29 (KR);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/30] | C07C149/43, C07C149/243, C07C149/42, C07C149/24, C07D213/30, A61K41/00, A61K43/00 | ||
Former IPC [1989/29] | C07C149/43, C07C149/243, C07C149/42, C07C149/24, C07D213/30, A61K43/00 | ||
Former IPC [1988/34] | C07C149/42, C07C149/24, C07D213/30, A61K43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Durch Estergruppen substituierte Diamindithiole und davon abgeleitete radioaktiv markierte Komplexe | [1988/34] | English: | Ester-substituted diaminedithiols and radiolabeled complexes thereof | [1988/34] | French: | Diaminodithiols substitués par esters et complexes marqués radioactifs dérivés de ceux-ci | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB742996 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [XD]US2810753 (BERSWORTH FREDERICK C); | [AD]US4434151 (BYRNE EDMUND F [US], et al); | [AD]US4444690 (FRITZBERG ALAN R [US]); | [AD]EP0135160 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [AD]EP0163119 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | [XD]EP0200211 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]); | [A]EP0200492 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2810753 | US4284619 | US4434151 | US4444690 | EP0123504 | EP0135160 | US4571430 | US4575556 | EP0200211 | - BLONDEAU ET AL., CAN. J. CHEM., (1967), vol. 45, page 49 | - BHARADWAJ ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1986), vol. 108, page 1351 | - M. T. NAGASAWA ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, page 591 | - BALDAS ET AL., INT. J. APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (1985), vol. 36, page 133 | - "PCNONLIN and NONLIN84: Software for the Statistical Analysis of Nonlinear Models", STATISTICAL CONSULTANTS. INC., (1986), vol. 40, page 52 |