EP0280972 - Hand piece for a liquid-jet cutting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1989 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagen, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Auf der Hut 25 D-8550 Forchheim / DE | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 88102452.5 | 19.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | DE19873706968 | 04.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3706968 | [1988/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0280972 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/39 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/3203 (EP);
A61B18/14 (EP);
A61B18/1402 (EP);
A61B2017/00973 (EP);
A61B2018/00928 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Handstück für eine Flüssigkeitsstrahl-Schneideinrichtung | [1988/36] | English: | Hand piece for a liquid-jet cutting apparatus | [1988/36] | French: | Instrument à main pour un dispositif de découpage à jet de liquide | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 19.12.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD234608 ; | [Y]US3532095 ; | [Y]FR2153679 ; | [Y]DE3215832 ; | [A]US4560373 ; | [A]DE2426781 ; | [A]US4359052 ; | [A]GB2165761 ; | [A]US4311144 ; | [A]EP0085658 ; | [A]GB2158723 |