EP0282770 - Optically active (meth)-acrylamides, process for their preparation and their use in the separation of racemates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bömer, Bruno, Dr. Max-Planck-Strasse 53 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Grosser, Rolf, Dr. Gellertstrasse 9 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Schwartz, Ulrich, Dr. Wiesdorfer Platz 10 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Arlt, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Rybniker Strasse 2 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 05 /
Piejko, Karl-Erwin, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 57 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1988/38] | Application number, filing date | 88102605.8 | 23.02.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19873706890 | 04.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3706890 | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282770 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282770 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/54, C07B57/00 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
B01J20/29 (EP,US);
B01J20/286 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/3217 (EP,US);
B01J20/327 (EP,US);
B01J20/3276 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/38] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive (Meth)acrylamide, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Racematspaltung | [1988/38] | English: | Optically active (meth)-acrylamides, process for their preparation and their use in the separation of racemates | [1988/38] | French: | (Méth)-acrylamides optiquement actifs, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation pour la séparation de racémates | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2500523 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [XP]EP0218089 (BAYER AG [DE]) |