EP0280262 - Method for making a smoking article and components for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Max Norris 630 Omar Drive Rural Hall North Carolina 27045 / US | 02 /
Barnes, Vernon Brent 6900 Mendelssohn Drive Clemmons North Carolina 27012 / US | 03 /
Clark, Douglas Copeland 5120 Angelia Drive Winston-Salem North Carolina 27106 / US | 04 /
Clearman, Jack Franklin Route 4 Box 243 Blakely Georgia 31723 / US | 05 /
Hensgen, Gerhard Neuengammer Hauptdeich 68 D-2050 Hamburg 80 / DE | 06 /
Shannon, Michael David 192A Sonata Drive Lewisville North Carolina 27023 / US | 07 /
Shelar, Gary Roger 5902 Pandora Drive Greensboro North Carolina 27410 / US | 08 /
Schubert, Alfred Bergedorferweg 20 D-2057 Wentorf / DE | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102666.0 | 24.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | US19870019826 | 27.02.1987 Original published format: US 19826 | US19870104202 | 02.10.1987 Original published format: US 104202 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280262 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280262 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24B15/16 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
A24C5/00 (EP,US);
A24F42/10 (KR);
A24F42/80 (KR);
A24D1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Rauchartikels und Bestandteile dafür | [1988/35] | English: | Method for making a smoking article and components for use therein | [1988/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un article à fumer et composants utilisés | [1988/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 05.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3036581 (GEORGE DEARSLEY); | [X]GB1107181 (DESMOND WALTER MOLINS, et al); | [AD]EP0174645 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]); | [XP]EP0236992 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) |