EP0281865 - Body made from inorganic fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Postbus 186 Velperweg 76 NL-6800 LS Arnhem / NL | [1988/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Josefiak, Christoph, Dr. Volkerstrasse 3 D-6149 Rimbach/Odenwald / DE | 02 /
Wegerhoff, Arno, Dr. Kronbergstrasse 7 D-8761 Wörth / DE | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Fett, Günter Akzo Patente GmbH, Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102798.1 | 25.02.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | DE19873707357 | 07.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3707357 | [1988/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281865 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281865 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/00 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C03C25/002 (EP);
C03C25/66 (EP);
C03C25/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Gebundene Flächengebilde aus anorganischen Fasern | [1988/37] | English: | Body made from inorganic fibres | [1988/37] | French: | Objets en fibres minérales | [1988/37] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 05.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2446334 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]US2338463 (FRANZ SKAUPY, et al); | [A]GB821362 (I O F GLASS FIBERS COMPANY) |