EP0282813 - Single grain seeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheufler, Bernd, Dr. Am Amazonenwerk 101 D-4507 Hasbergen / DE | [1988/38] | Application number, filing date | 88103125.6 | 02.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | DE19873708205 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3708205 | [1988/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282813 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/10 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
A01C7/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1988/38] | Title | German: | Einzelkornsämaschine | [1988/38] | English: | Single grain seeder | [1988/38] | French: | Semoir à graines isolées | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2132395 ; | [Y]DE3001926 ; | [A]DE3502011 ; | [A]FR2414861 |