EP0281158 - Inductively coupled plasma torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION 761 Main Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06859-0181 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION 761 Main Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06859-0181 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morrisroe, Peter J. 27 Cornwall Drive New Milford, CT. 06776 / US | 02 /
Zander, Andrew T. 5 Music Hill Road Brookfield, CT. 06805 / US | 03 /
Manning, David C. 61 Oldfield Road Trumbull, CT. 06611 / US | 04 /
Gagne, Peter H. 9 Fieldstone Road Brookfield, CT. 06804 / US | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/36] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103413.6 | 04.03.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | US19870022910 | 06.03.1987 Original published format: US 22910 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281158 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281158 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281158 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/30, H05H1/36 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
H05H1/30 (EP,US);
H05H1/2475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/36] | Title | German: | Induktiv gekoppelter Plasmabrenner | [1988/36] | English: | Inductively coupled plasma torch | [1988/36] | French: | Torche à plasma, à couplage inductif | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3546522 (THORPE MERLE L); | [AD]US4266113 (DENTON MEDONA B, et al); | [AD]US4482246 (MEYER GERHARD A [US], et al) |