EP0282071 - Optical switching system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melindo, Flavio Via Valgioie, 71 Torino / IT | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Van der Werth, Lederer & Riederer Postfach 2664 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103868.1 | 11.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | IT19870067187 | 12.03.1987 Original published format: IT 6718787 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282071 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282071 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282071 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/52, H04Q11/04, H04L12/54, H04B10/00 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
C03C14/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/106 (EP,US);
H04L49/1553 (EP,US);
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04L49/405 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5605 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5652 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/37] | H04Q3/52, H04Q11/04, H04L11/20, H04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Optisches Schaltsystem | [1988/37] | English: | Optical switching system | [1988/37] | French: | Système de commutation optique | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 11.07.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3979733 (FRASER ALEXANDER GIBSON); | [A]US4325147 (ROTHLAUF ALAN P); | [X]GB2139443 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) | [XP] - PHOTONIC SWITCHING TOPICAL MEETING, Incline Village, Nevada, 18th-20th March 1987, pages 35-37, Optical Society of America, Incline Village, Nevada, US; A. DE BOSIO et al.: "Deterministic and statistic circuit assignement architectures for optical switching systems" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, Florence, 7th-11th May 1984, part 2, session 41A, paper 4, pages 1-7, Florence, IT; R.W. BLACKMORE et al.: "An opto-electronic exchange of the future" |