EP0287803 - Hub cap for a motor vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leichtmetall-Auto-Zubehör Walter H.S. Albrecht GmbH & Co. KG Kochstrasse 56 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states Leichtmetall-Auto-Zubehör Walter H.S. Albrecht GmbH & Co. KG Kochstrasse 56 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leimkühler, Dieter Heckschenstrasse 67 D-4150 Krefeld-Oppum / DE | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Stark, Walter Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Moerser Strasse 140 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 88103976.2 | 14.03.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | DE19870005840U | 22.04.1987 Original published format: DE 8705840 U | DE19873732587 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732587 | [1988/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287803 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287803 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287803 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60B7/06 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
B60B7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Radzierblende für eine KfZ-Radfelge | [1988/43] | English: | Hub cap for a motor vehicle wheel | [1988/43] | French: | Enjoliveur pour roue de véhicule automobile | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2061838 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]US4596425 (HUNG RONG-TSAN [TW]); | [A]EP0187228 (LEICHTMETALL AUTO ZUBEHOR WALT) |