EP0283002 - Optical head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiono, Teruhiro 15-18, Nagayoshi-Rokutan 1-chome Hirano-ku Osaka City, 547 / JP | 02 /
Setsune, Kentaro 24-9, Niwashirodai 4-chome Sakai City, 590-01 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Osamu 8-A814, Kamishinden 4-chome Toyonaka City, 565 / JP | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104200.6 | 16.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | JP19870061562 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: JP 6156287 | JP19870115019 | 12.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11501987 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283002 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283002 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283002 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/135, G11B7/12, G02B27/10 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/0909 (EP,US);
G11B7/0916 (EP,US);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/1356 (EP,US);
G11B7/1381 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/38] | G11B7/135, G02B27/10, G11B7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/38] | Title | German: | Optischer Kopf | [1988/38] | English: | Optical head | [1988/38] | French: | Tête optique | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP62001141 ; | [AP]JP61289544 ; | [A]JP60187941 ; | [A]EP0137272 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2107483 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE3341589 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 170 (P-581)(2617) 2 June 1987,& JP-A-62 001 141 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 7 January 1987,, & JP62001141 A 19870107 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 153 (P-577)(2600) 19 May 1987,& JP-A-61 289 544 (CANON INC) 19 December 1986,, & JP61289544 A 19861219 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 41 (P-429)(2098) 18 February 1986,& JP-A-60 187 941 (SEIKO DENSHI KOGYO K.K.) 25 September 1985,, & JP60187941 A 19850925 | Examination | EP0278406 |