EP0283919 - Crash bag propellant compositions for generating high quality nitrogen gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cartwright, Richard Vance, Dr. RD 4, Box 93-B Sussex New Jersey 07461 / US | 02 /
Hardwick, Steven John, Dr. 9 Liane Road Cragmere Woods Wilmington Delaware 19809 / US | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104202.2 | 16.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | US19870030802 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: US 30802 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283919 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283919 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C06D5/06, C06B35/00 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
C06B35/00 (EP,US);
C06D5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/39] | Title | German: | Einen Aufprallbeutel aufblasende Zusammensetzung zur Erzeugung von sauberem Stickstoffgas | [1988/39] | English: | Crash bag propellant compositions for generating high quality nitrogen gas | [1988/39] | French: | Composition de propergol pour coussins de sécurité produisant de l'azote de haute qualité | [1988/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 13.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4376002 (UTRACKI LECHOSLAW A M [CA]); | [AD]US4533416 (POOLE DONALD R [US]); | [A]FR2292687 (EATON CORP [US]) |