EP0284937 - Method for the production of 2-benzyl fatty acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Horst-Jürgen, Dr. Am Nettchesfeld 22 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1988/40] | Application number, filing date | 88104454.9 | 21.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | DE19873710516 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3710516 | [1988/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284937 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284937 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/00, C07C57/30 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
C07D263/12 (EP,US);
C07C51/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/00, C07C57/30 (EP,US);
C07C51/00, C07C57/58 (US,EP);
C07C51/00, C07C59/64 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Benzylfettsäuren | [1988/40] | English: | Method for the production of 2-benzyl fatty acids | [1988/40] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'acides gras 2-benzyliques | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 15.10.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53034742 ; | [A]US4477384 (SEROTA SAMUEL [US], et al) | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY Band 46, 1981, Seiten 4147-4151, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. SEROTA et al.: "Novel synthesis of alpha-substituted acrylic acid." | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Seite 972 (C-78); JP 53034743 A (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO) 31.03.1978 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Seite 972 (C-78); & JP 53034742 A (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO) 31.03.1978, & JP53034742 A 00000000 |