EP0289770 - Directional multiway valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Backé, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Nizzaallee 23 D-52072 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Kolvenbach, Heiner, Dr.-Ing. Kasinostrasse 53 D-52066 Aachen / DE | [1988/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Rauh, Wolfgang Kurt Patentanwalt Mittelstrasse 55 52072 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Rauh, Wolfgang K., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mittelstrasse 55 D-52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104710.4 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873714691 | 02.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3714691 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289770 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289770 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289770 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/04, F16K11/07, F16K11/085 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
F16K11/0716 (EP);
F16K11/0856 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/45] | F15B13/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Mehrwegeventil | [1988/45] | English: | Directional multiway valve | [1988/45] | French: | Distributeur à plusieurs voies | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.02.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   16.03.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1990 | 31.03.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.07.1993 | SE | 25.03.1994 | [2001/51] |
Former [1997/17] | BE | 28.07.1993 | |
Former [1994/25] | BE | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB771562 ; | [X]GB992977 ; | [X]FR1565901 ; | [X]US2106572 ; | [X]US3591135 ; | [A]FR966043 | [A] - THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, Band 181, Teil 1, Nr. 4, Seiten 75-88, William Clowes and Sons, Ltd, London and Beccles, GB; M.H. LORENZ et al.: "Oil hydraulic spool valve operating times" |