EP0284063 - Hydrogen storage alloy electrode and method for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA BATTERY CO., LTD. 4-10, Minamishinagawa 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA BATTERY CO., LTD. 4-10, Minamishinagawa 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuyasu, Kiyoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kanda, Motoya c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Takeno, Kazuta Toshiba Battery Co., Ltd 4-10, Minamishinagawa 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kochiwa, Kenichi Toshiba Battery Co., Ltd 4-10, Minamishinagawa 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104735.1 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | JP19870069225 | 25.03.1987 Original published format: JP 6922587 | JP19880060441 | 16.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6044188 | [1992/13] |
Former [1988/39] | JP19870069225 | 25.03.1987 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284063 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284063 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/00, H01M4/62 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
H01M4/621 (EP);
H01M4/242 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/39] | Title | German: | Elektrode aus wasserstoffspeichernder Legierung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/39] | English: | Hydrogen storage alloy electrode and method for preparing the same | [1988/39] | French: | Electrode à alliage emmagasinant de l'hydrogène et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58225563 ; | [AD]GB2162994 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP0089141 (INCO RES & DEV CENTER INC [US]); | [A]FR1296372 (ACCUMULATOREN FABRIK AG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 78 (E-237)[1515], 10th April 1984; & JP-A-58 225 563 (FUJI DENKI KAGAKU K.K.) 27-12-1983, & JP58225563 A 00000000 |