EP0285927 - Thermostat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofsäss, Ulrika Strietweg 45 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | For all designated states Hofsäss, Marcel Peter Strietweg 45 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | For all designated states Hofsäss, Denise Petra Wurmberger Strasse 53 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | For all designated states Hofsäss, Henrik Peter Studtstrasse 31 D-48149 Münster / DE | For all designated states Hofsäss, Carola Rika Strietweg 45 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | For all designated states Hofsäss, Benjamin Michael Strietweg 45 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | [1994/44] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states Hofsäss, Peter Strietweg 45 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofsäss, Peter deceased / DE | [1994/46] |
Former [1988/41] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104812.8 | 25.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | DE19873711666 | 07.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3711666 | [1988/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285927 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285927 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285927 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01H37/54 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
H01H1/50 (EP);
H01H37/5418 (EP);
H01H1/504 (EP);
H01H37/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Temperaturschalter | [1988/41] | English: | Thermostat | [1988/41] | French: | Thermostat | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.11.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB531794 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC INT CO); | [X]US2298928 (CLARK EARL K, et al); | [Y]FR989171 ; | [A]US2703351 (HULBERT FRANCIS L); | [Y]FR1358047 (HUBER & CIE A G J); | [Y]GB956240 (VICTOR GRAVES VAUGHAN); | [Y]US3243554 (MALONE HOMER F); | [A]DE1590337 (EBERLE WERKE KG); | [A]FR2204029 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [Y]FR2462013 (LIMITOR AG [CH]); | [Y]DE8625999U |