EP0284087 - A shaft torsional vibration monitor for a multi-mass rotary shaft system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagi, Yasuomi 405, 7-1, Nishi Narusawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1993/23] |
Former [1988/39] | 01 /
Yagi, Yasuomi 405, 7-1, Nishi Narsawa-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88104837.5 | 25.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | JP19870071757 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7175787 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284087 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284087 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284087 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/10 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
G01H1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1988/39] | Title | German: | Achsentorsionsvibrations-Überwachungsgerät für eine Anordnung mit mehreren Massen an einer rotierenden Achse | [1988/39] | English: | A shaft torsional vibration monitor for a multi-mass rotary shaft system | [1988/39] | French: | Moniteur de vibrations en torsion d'un axe pour un dispositif à plusieurs masses à un axe en rotation | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4276782 (SHIMA ICHIJI, et al); | [A]US4635210 (SHIOHATA KOUKI [JP], et al) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, vol. EC-1, no. 4, December 1986, pages 99-107, IEEE, New York, NY, US; R. BIGRET et al.: "Measuring the torsional modal frequencies of a 900 MW turbogenerator" |