EP0286900 - Monitoring system for detecting malfunction of knotting mechanism on a crop baler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HESSTON BRAUD (Société Anonyme) F-85220 Coex / FR | [1989/41] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states HESSTON S.A. Division Coex F-85220 - Coex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrag, Thomas Gene RR1 Box 92-S Hesston Kansas 67062 / US | 02 /
Hood, Charles F. P.O.Box 520 135 Wolf Creek Road Ranchester Wyoming 82839 / US | 03 /
Morton, Scott A. P.O.Box 520 135 Wolf Creek Road Ranchester Wyoming 82839 / US | 04 /
Graber, Kurt 225 West Hirschler Moundridge Kansas 67107 / US | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1988/42] | Buzzi, Franco c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88104976.1 | 28.03.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | US19870038779 | 15.04.1987 Original published format: US 38779 | [1989/02] |
Former [1988/42] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286900 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286900 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/14, B65H63/02 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
A01F15/148 (EP,US);
B65H69/00 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | Fehlerüberwachungssystem für die Bindevorrichtung einer Ballenpresse | [1988/42] | English: | Monitoring system for detecting malfunction of knotting mechanism on a crop baler | [1988/42] | French: | Système d'indication pour détecter une défaillance dans un mécanisme noueur d'une presse à balles | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 02.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.02.1992 | BE | 05.02.1992 | CH | 05.02.1992 | GR | 05.02.1992 | IT | 05.02.1992 | LI | 05.02.1992 | NL | 05.02.1992 | SE | 05.02.1992 | ES | 30.03.1992 | LU | 31.03.1992 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 05.02.1992 | |
BE | 05.02.1992 | ||
CH | 05.02.1992 | ||
GR | 05.02.1992 | ||
IT | 05.02.1992 | ||
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 05.02.1992 | |
BE | 05.02.1992 | ||
CH | 05.02.1992 | ||
IT | 05.02.1992 | ||
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 05.02.1992 | |
BE | 05.02.1992 | ||
CH | 05.02.1992 | ||
IT | 05.02.1992 | ||
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | AT | 05.02.1992 | |
BE | 05.02.1992 | ||
CH | 05.02.1992 | ||
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 05.02.1992 | |
CH | 05.02.1992 | ||
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | CH | 05.02.1992 | |
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 05.02.1992 | |
LI | 05.02.1992 | ||
NL | 05.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 05.02.1992 | |
LI | 05.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2824184 (MANDLECO JAMES E); | [A]US3880001 (HOGAN EDWARD MERRICK); | [YD]US4196661 (PETERSON WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [Y]US4269116 (GORDON GOSS E, et al); | [Y]EP0181969 (SPERRY NV [BE]) |