EP0288775 - Earth working tool having a working element fabricated from cemented tungsten carbide compositions with enhanced properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. One Lloyd Avenue P.O. Box 231 Latrobe Pennsylvania 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. One Lloyd Avenue P.O. Box 231 Latrobe Pennsylvania 15650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenfield, Mark S. 119 Cheshire Drive Greensburg Pennsylvania 15601-5934 / US | 02 /
Conley, Edward V. 10187 Lavonne Drive Irwin Pennsylvania 15642 / US | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105265.8 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | US19870043569 | 28.04.1987 Original published format: US 43569 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288775 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288775 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21C35/18, C22C29/08 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
E21C35/183 (EP,US);
E21C35/1835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12056 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12139 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Erdbearbeitungswerkzeug mit einem Arbeitselement aus Wolframcarbidzement-Verbindungen mit verbesserten Eigenschaften | [1988/44] | English: | Earth working tool having a working element fabricated from cemented tungsten carbide compositions with enhanced properties | [1988/44] | French: | Outil de travail du sol ayant un élément de travail composé en carbure de tungstène fritté à propriétés modifiées | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.11.1992 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 16.12.1992 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2343885 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2017153 (KRUPP GMBH); | [A]DE3005684 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) | Examination | - KENNAMETAL PRODUCT BROCHURE |