EP0286090 - Improved composite separation membranes and the preparation and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bikson, Benjamin 18 Gibbs Street Brookline 02146, Mass. / US | 02 /
Giglia, Salvatore 7-2 Endicott Street Norwood, 02062 Mass. / US | 03 /
Kharas, Gregory 7 Crockett Drive Chelmsford, 10824 Mass. / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105552.9 | 07.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870035783 | 08.04.1987 Original published format: US 35783 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286090 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286090 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/00, B01D65/00, B01D67/00, B01D69/00, B01D71/00 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/41] | B01D13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Verbundtrennmembranen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1988/41] | English: | Improved composite separation membranes and the preparation and use thereof | [1988/41] | French: | Membranes composites de séparation, leur fabrication et leur utilisation | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 24.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4575385 (BROOKS ALBERT A [US], et al); | [AD]US4527999 (LEE CHENG H [US]); | [A]FR2166113 (DU PONT) |