EP0335999 - Method of cleaning metal tubes, in particular cupper-tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIELAND-WERKE AG Postfach 4240 Graf-Arco-Strasse D-7900 Ulm (Donau) / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states Wieland-Werke AG Postfach 4240 Graf-Arco-Strasse D-7900 Ulm (Donau) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sick, Hans, Dr. Lärchenstrasse 32 D-7913 Senden / DE | [1989/41] | Application number, filing date | 88105615.4 | 08.04.1988 | [1989/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335999 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/32 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B24C3/327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Metallrohren, insbes. Kupferrohren | [1989/41] | English: | Method of cleaning metal tubes, in particular cupper-tubes | [1989/41] | French: | Méthode de nettoyage des tubes métalliques, en particulier des tubes en cuivre | [1989/41] | File destroyed: | 29.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1988 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 16.11.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1070867 ; | [YD]DE3003228 ; | [A]US4579596 ; | [A]DE2337022 ; | [A]DE3408828 |