EP0289819 - Modulated laser source for optical storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjorklund, Gary Carl 1201 Eureka Avenue Los Altos California 94022 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88105798.8 | 12.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870046967 | 06.05.1987 Original published format: US 46967 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289819 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289819 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/109, G02F1/37 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
G02F1/37 (EP,US);
H01S3/109 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/45] | G02F1/37 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/45] | Title | German: | Modulierte Laserquelle für optische Speicher | [1988/45] | English: | Modulated laser source for optical storage | [1988/45] | French: | Source laser modulée pour mémoire optique | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4427260 (PUECH CLAUDE [FR], et al); | [A]US4631732 (CHRISTENSEN CLAD P [US]); | [A]DE3631909 (QUANTRONIX CORP [US]); | [A]US4653056 (BAER THOMAS M [US], et al); | [A]US4660206 (HALMOS MAURICE J [US], et al) |