EP0287085 - Polysiloxane coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sittenthaler, Wilhelm, Dr.-Dipl.-Chem. Robert-Koch-Strasse 136 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Marquardt, Klaus, Dr.-Dipl.-Chem. Lindacherstrasse 77 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Deubzer, Bernward, Dr.-Dipl.-Chem. Virchowstrasse 14 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
Eglseder, Anton Röntgenstrasse 25 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | [1988/42] | Application number, filing date | 88105919.0 | 14.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | DE19873713126 | 16.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3713126 | [1988/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287085 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287085 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287085 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/06, C09D127/06 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
C09D127/06 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D127/06, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/42] | C09D3/82, C09D3/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/42] | Title | German: | Siliconhaltige Anstrichsysteme | [1988/42] | English: | Polysiloxane coating composition | [1988/42] | French: | Compositions de revêtement à base de siloxanes | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3294709 (SIEGFRIED NITZSCHE, et al); | [YD]DE1671280 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH); | [Y]EP0117608 (DOW CORNING [US]) |