EP0295382 - Device for separating and sorting workpieces and for conveying them in an aligned position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPERT Maschinenbau GmbH Seehofstrasse 56-58 64653 Lorsch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states EXPERT Maschinenbau GmbH Seehofstrasse 56-58 D-64653 Lorsch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Heinz Fliederweg 4 D-6141 Einhausen / DE | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Helber, Friedrich, et al Zenz, Helber & Hosbach Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 D-64673 Zwingenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Helber, Friedrich G., Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber & Hosbach Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 D-64673 Zwingenberg / DE | ||
Former [1988/51] | Helber, Friedrich G., Dipl.-Ing. Zenz, Helber & Hosbach Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 D-64673 Zwingenberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88105941.4 | 14.04.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | DE19873716090 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3716090 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295382 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295382 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/14, B23Q7/12 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
B65G47/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vereinzelung, Sortierung und lagerichtig ausgerichteten Weiterförderung von Werkstücken | [1988/51] | English: | Device for separating and sorting workpieces and for conveying them in an aligned position | [1988/51] | French: | Dispositif pour la séparation, le triage et le transport dans une position alignée de pièces | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4174028 ; | [A]DE1246561 ; | [A]GB2158815 ; | [A]DE2045950 ; | [A]US1879156 ; | [A]US1604128 ; | [A]DD25738 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN |