EP0287120 - Semiconductor memory device having improved sense amplifier arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hannai, Seiichi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/09] |
Former [1988/42] | 01 /
Hannai, Seiichi c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106063.6 | 15.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | JP19870092909 | 15.04.1987 Original published format: JP 9290987 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287120 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287120 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287120 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, G11C7/06, G11C11/409 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G11C7/065 (EP,US);
G11C11/40 (KR);
G11C11/4091 (EP,US);
G11C11/4097 (EP,US);
G11C7/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/42] | G11C7/00, G11C11/24, G11C7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/42] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeichervorrichtung mit einer Abfühlverstärkeranordnung | [1988/42] | English: | Semiconductor memory device having improved sense amplifier arrangement | [1988/42] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs avec un agencement d'amplificateurs de détection | [1988/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4656613 (NORWOOD ROGER D [US], et al); | [A]US4233675 (KARP JOEL A, et al) |