EP0288900 - CD retaining device and adaptor for CD's [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiger, Erich, Dipl.-Ing. Panoramaweg 19 D-7734 Unterkirnach / DE | 02 /
Hermann, Hans Ginsterweg 36 D-7742 St. Georgen / DE | 03 /
Scheffler, Wilfried Auf Schalmen 23 D-7710 Donaueschingen / DE | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Robert Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106366.3 | 21.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | DE19873714251 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3714251 | [1988/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288900 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288900 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/028, G11B23/00 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
G11B17/0281 (EP);
G11B17/22 (KR);
G11B23/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | CD-Halterungsvorrichtung sowie Adapter für CDs | [1988/44] | English: | CD retaining device and adaptor for CD's | [1988/44] | French: | Dispositif de support ainsi qu'adaptateur pour disque compact | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0283221 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, Sektion P, Band 11, Nr. 79, 11. MÛrz 1987 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 92 P 555 |