EP0289907 - Device for the controlled combustion of ignitable hydrogen-air mixtures in the containments of water-cooled nuclear reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heck, Reinhard Kurfürstenstrasse 43 D-6450 Hanau 1 / DE | [1988/45] | Application number, filing date | 88106613.8 | 25.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873715469 | 08.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715469 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289907 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289907 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/30, F23Q3/00 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
G21C19/317 (EP,US);
F23Q3/00 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur kontrollierten Verbrennung von zündfähigen Wasserstoff-Luft-Gemischen im Containment von wassergekühlten Kernreaktoranlagen | [1988/45] | English: | Device for the controlled combustion of ignitable hydrogen-air mixtures in the containments of water-cooled nuclear reactors | [1988/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la combustion contrôlée d'un mélange détonable air-hydrogène dans le confinement de réacteurs nucléaires refroidis à l'eau | [1992/28] |
Former [1988/45] | Dispositif pour la combustion contrôlée d'un mélange détonable eau-hydrogène dans le confinement de réacteurs nucléaires refroidis à l'eau | Examination procedure | 25.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4425495 (CAKE MARCUS P [US], et al); | [A]FR2198095 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [A]US2856564 (DERWIN JOHN W); | [AD]DE3004677 (BABCOCK BROWN BOVERI REAKTOR [DE]) |