EP0293595 - Ionomer resin and preparation of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited No. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Machida, Shuji Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited No. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88106635.1 | 26.04.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | JP19870104530 | 30.04.1987 Original published format: JP 10453087 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293595 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293595 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293595 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02, C08F220/04, C08F8/12, C08F220/12, // (C08F210/02, 220:04, 220:04),(C08F220/04, 210:02, 220:04) | [1988/49] | CPC: |
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08F210/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR);
C08F220/14 (KR);
C08F8/12 (KR);
C08L23/08 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/12, C08F210/02 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F210/02 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/02, C08F220/06 (US); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Ionomerharz und seine Herstellung | [1988/49] | English: | Ionomer resin and preparation of same | [1988/49] | French: | Résine ionomère et sa préparation | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.01.1994 | CH | 05.01.1994 | IT | 05.01.1994 | LI | 05.01.1994 | SE | 05.01.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
CH | 05.01.1994 | ||
IT | 05.01.1994 | ||
LI | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 05.01.1994 | |
CH | 05.01.1994 | ||
LI | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/44] | CH | 05.01.1994 | |
LI | 05.01.1994 | ||
SE | 05.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 05.01.1994 | |
LI | 05.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0104316 ; | [A]US4638034 (MCCLAIN DOROTHEE M [US]); | [A]EP0218254 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) |