EP0289919 - N-Substituted azoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buerstinghaus, Rainer, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 2 D-4404 Telgte / DE | 02 /
Neubauer, Hans-Juergen, Dr. B 4,2 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Hofmeister, Peter, Dr. Bernard-Humblot-Strasse 12 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Kuenast, Christoph, Dr. Salierstrasse 2 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | 05 /
Leyendecker, Joachim, Dr. Scharnhorststrasse 12 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
Kardorff, Uwe, Dr. Frankenthaler Strasse 42 D-6710 Frankenthal 6 / DE | [1988/45] | Application number, filing date | 88106696.3 | 27.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | DE19873714709 | 02.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3714709 | DE19883801919 | 23.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3801919 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289919 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289919 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289919 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/68, C07D233/56, C07D231/12, C07D231/16, C07D249/08, C07D249/10, C07D231/56, C07D235/06, C07D235/08, A01N43/50, A01N43/52 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D231/16 (KR);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/52 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D231/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/68 (EP,US);
C07D235/06 (EP,US);
C07D235/08 (EP,US);
C07D249/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1988/45] | Title | German: | N-substituierte Azole | [1988/45] | English: | N-Substituted azoles | [1988/45] | French: | Azoles N-substitués | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61148168 ; | [A]JP61017569 ; | [A]EP0175652 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0113570 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 106, Nr. 3, 19. J{nner 1987, Columbus, Ohio, USA SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO. "Preparation of benzimidazole derivatives as pesticides" Seite 607, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 18 545y & JP-A-61 148 168 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO.), & JP61148168 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 104, Nr. 21, 26. Mai 1986, Columbus, Ohio, USA SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO. "Benzimidazole derivatives" Seite 634, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 186 419n & JP-A-61 017 569 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO.), & JP61017569 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0132606 |