EP0293622 - Process for preparing barium sulphate having a chemically reactive surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aderhold, Clemens, Dr. Lerchenfeldstrasse 21 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Röhrborn, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Terniepenweg 88 D-4133 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | [1988/49] | Application number, filing date | 88107215.1 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | DE19873718277 | 30.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3718277 | [1988/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293622 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293622 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C08K3/24, C04B33/13 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
C09C1/027 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C01P2002/82 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bariumsulfat mit chemoreaktiver Oberfläche | [1988/49] | English: | Process for preparing barium sulphate having a chemically reactive surface | [1988/49] | French: | Procédé de préparation de sulfate de baryum chimiquement réactif en surface | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58120520 ; | [X]JP85028766B ; | [X]GB466216 (LAPORTE LTD B, et al); | [A]US2081835 (PIERCE JR JAMES B); | [XD]DE1717096 (BAYER AG); | [XD]EP0011752 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 100, Nr. 16, April 1984, Seite 87, Zusammenfassung Nr. 122840c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 120 520 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD) 18-07-1983, & JP58120520 A 00000000 | [X] - WORLD SURFACE COATINGS ABSTRACTS, Band 59, Nr. 523, Januar 1986, Seiten 1-10, Zusammenfassung Nr. 86/00026, Oxford, GB; & JP-B-85 028 766 (ONAHAMA SAKAI KAGAKU CO.), & JP85028766B B 00000000 |