EP0291804 - Proteins with a TNF effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doerper, Thomas, Dr. Luitpoldstrasse 3 D-6719 Bissersheim / DE | 02 /
Moeller, Achim, Dr. Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 51 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Hillen, Heinz, Dr. Fasanenstrasse 10 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Keilhauer, Gerhard, Dr. Industriestrasse 20 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 05 /
Emling, Franz, Dr. Valentin-Bauer-Strasse 22 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Lothar, Daum, Dr. Reiherstrasse 25 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | [1988/47] | Application number, filing date | 88107401.7 | 07.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | DE19873716513 | 16.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3716513 | [1988/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291804 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291804 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K13/00, C12P21/02, A61K37/02 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/525 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Proteine mit TNF-Wirkung | [1988/47] | English: | Proteins with a TNF effect | [1988/47] | French: | Protéines à effet de TNF | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0155549 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0207751 | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, Band 81, Oktober 1984, Seiten 5985-5988, Washington, US; M.D. PIERSCHBACHER und E. RUOSLAHTI: "Variants of the cell recognition site of fibronectin that retain attachment-promoting activity" | [T] - BIOCHEMISTRY, dritte Ausgabe, 1988, Kapitel II, Seiten 277-279; L. STRYER: "Connective-tissue proteins" |