EP0291811 - Slide with a rolling security device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schock Metallwerk GmbH Siemensstrasse 1-3 D-73660 Urbach / DE | [1988/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wied, Arno Lortzingstrasse 51 D-7053 Kernen / DE | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107418.1 | 07.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | DE19873717359 | 22.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3717359 | [1988/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291811 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291811 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/16, A47B88/14 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
A47B88/467 (EP);
A47B2210/0032 (EP);
A47B2210/0059 (EP);
A47B88/53 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/47] | A47B88/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Auszugführung mit Ausrollsicherung | [1988/47] | English: | Slide with a rolling security device | [1988/47] | French: | Glissière à sécurité de roulement | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/42] | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3414202 [ ]; | DE3324379 [ ]; | DE2707365 [ ]; | US3901565 [ ]; | DE3425517 [ ]; | EP0041616 [ ] |