EP0341329 - A multi-floor elevating parking station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tseng, Wen-Kung No. 57, Chin Nian 2nd Road Kaohsiung / TW | For all designated states Tseng, Hong-Jang No. 57, Chin Nian 2nd Road Kaohsiung / TW | [1989/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tseng, Wen-Kung No. 57, Chin Nian 2nd Road Kaohsiung / TW | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107579.0 | 11.05.1988 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341329 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341329 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/18, E04H6/42 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
E04H6/424 (EP,US);
E04H6/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Versenkbare mehrstöckige Parkplätze | [1989/46] | English: | A multi-floor elevating parking station | [1989/46] | French: | Garage mobile à plusieurs étages | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB495189 (FREDERICK CHARLES WHITTON, et al); | [A]US2687815 (SIMON RAYMOND H J); | [A]FR1280795 ; | [A]DE1684725 (HOUSCHKA BERTHOLD, et al); | [A]US3717266 (GENEST A, et al); | [A]DE2317695 (WEBER BERNHARD) |