EP0292817 - Circuit for obtaining bipolar digital signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Hirschmann GmbH & Co. Postfach 110 73726 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states Richard Hirschmann GmbH & Co. Postfach 110 D-73726 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states Richard Hirschmann Radiotechnisches Werk Richard-Hirschmann-Strasse 19 Postfach 110 D-73702 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludolf, Wilhelm, Dr. Bärbelesweg 9 D-7440 Nürtingen-Hardt / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Bernhard Silberburgstrasse 185 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 03 /
Schenkyr, Rainer Römerstrasse 15 D-7316 Köngen / DE | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr., Dipl.Phys., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | Stadler, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Richard Hirschmann GmbH & Co. Abteilung PRP Postfach 16 49 D-72606 Nürtingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107771.3 | 14.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | DE19873718001 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3718001 | [1988/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292817 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292817 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/22 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
H04L25/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/48] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung bipolarer digitaler Datensignale | [1988/48] | English: | Circuit for obtaining bipolar digital signals | [1988/48] | French: | Circuit pour l'obtention de signaux numériques bipolaires | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1598679 ; | [Y]US4355423 | [A] - COMPUTER DESIGN, Band 20, Nr. 11, November 1981, Seiten 233-238,240; B. ROEHR: "VMOS transistors interface ICs to high power loads" |