EP0292822 - Substituted nitroalkenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Hilmar, Dr. Haus Gravener Strasse 105 D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Becker, Benedikt, Dr. Metzkausener Strasse 14 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
Stendel, Wilhelm, Dr. In den Birken 55 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 04 /
Homeyer, Bernhard, Dr. Obere Strasse 28 D-5090 Leverkussen 3 / DE | [1988/48] | Application number, filing date | 88107802.6 | 16.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | DE19873717837 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3717837 | [1988/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292822 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292822 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292822 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D417/06, C07D277/32, C07D413/06, C07D403/06, A01N43/50, A01N43/78, A01N43/76, A01N43/82, A01N43/74, A01N43/54 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/60 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
A01N43/86 (EP,US);
A01N47/16 (EP,US);
A01N47/22 (EP,US);
A01N47/38 (EP,US);
A01N57/32 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/48] | Title | German: | Substituierte Nitroalkene | [1988/48] | English: | Substituted nitroalkenes | [1988/48] | French: | Nitroalkènes substitués | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3993648 (POWELL JAMES E); | [A]US3962234 (ROMAN STEVEN A); | [AD]EP0192060 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]); | [A]US4053619 (KOLLMEYER WILLY D); | [A]EP0212600 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0163855 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0154178 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]); | [A]US4029791 (KOLLMEYER WILLY D, et al); | [A]DE2624530 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) |