EP0296351 - Disc-brake for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 80710 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 D-80710 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katzer, Ernst Friedenspromenade 85 D-8000 München 82 / DE | 02 /
Starck, Günter Sonnenhang 20 D-8069 Ilmmünster / DE | [1988/52] | Application number, filing date | 88107818.2 | 16.05.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | DE19873717303 | 22.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3717303 | [1988/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296351 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296351 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B61H5/00 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
F16D55/2245 (EP);
B61H5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1990/26] |
Former [1988/52] | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Scheibenbremse für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1988/52] | English: | Disc-brake for railway vehicles | [1988/52] | French: | Frein à disque pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2135676 (SIMMERING GRAZ PAUKER AG); | [AD]DE2449853 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [A]DE1912285 (BROMSREGULATOR SVENSKA AB); | [AD]DE2609445 ; | [A]US2242060 (EKSERGIAN CAROLUS L) |