EP0291916 - Dithioacetal compounds, processes for preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/47] | New dithioacetal compounds, processes for preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same | ||
[1992/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oku, Teruo 17-1, Umezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 02 /
Kawai, Yoshio 15-2, Umezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 03 /
Kayakiri, Hiroshi 5-4, Umezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 04 /
Kuratani, Kazuyoshi 2-25-10, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi / JP | 05 /
Hashimoto, Masashi 11-6, Takezono 2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107851.3 | 17.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | GB19870011802 | 19.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8711802 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291916 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291916 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/24, C07D277/64, C07D339/00, C07D263/58, C07D231/54, C07D471/04, C07D239/72, C07D215/14, C07D213/30, A61K31/425 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07C323/16 (KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C07D215/14 (EP,US);
C07D235/12 (EP,US);
C07D239/74 (EP,US);
C07D263/56 (EP,US);
C07D277/32 (EP,US);
C07D277/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Dithioacetal-Verbindungen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1988/47] | English: | Dithioacetal compounds, processes for preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same | [1992/33] | French: | Composés de dithioacetales, procédé pour leur préparation et composés pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1988/47] |
Former [1988/47] | New dithioacetal compounds, processes for preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same | Examination procedure | 13.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 26.01.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 14.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.1992 | BE | 12.08.1992 | DE | 12.08.1992 | ES | 12.08.1992 | FR | 12.08.1992 | GR | 12.08.1992 | IT | 12.08.1992 | NL | 12.08.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
ES | 12.08.1992 | ||
GR | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
GR | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
NL | 12.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | US4102858 [ ] (MINAGAWA MOTONOBU, et al); | DE2928037 [ ] (OREAL); | EP0113587 [ ] (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]); | US4535164 [ ] (DI PARDO ROBERT M [US], et al); | EP0190722 [ ] (USV PHARMA CORP [US]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 104, No. 5, February 3, 1986, Columbus, Ohio, USA Smith Kline Beckman Corp. "Lenkotriene Antagonists." page 528, column 1, Abstract-No. 33 866f & Jpn. Kokai Tokkyo Koho JP 60-161 965 (85-161 195) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 85, No. 1, July 5, 1976, Columbus, Ohio, USA NAGAKURA, I.; HAYASHIDO, A. "2-(4--Chlorophenyl)-3-Substituted Tetrahydro-1,3-Thiazin-4-One 1,1-Di-Oxides" page 457, column 1, Abstract-No. 5 655g & Japan. Kokai 75-149 689 | Examination | EP0110405 |