EP0295444 - Pipe connection for a hot fluid conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Witzenmann GmbH Metallschlauch-Fabrik Pforzheim Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states Witzenmann GmbH Metallschlauch-Fabrik Pforzheim Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doerge, Franz Brunnenstrasse 26, I D-7538 Keltern 3 / DE | 02 /
Erlenmayer, Udo Am Roten Maeuerle 28 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | 03 /
Faber, Bernd, Dr. Ing. Buehlstrasse 25 D-7850 Loerrach / DE | 04 /
Herty, Winfried Redtenbacherstr. 27 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | 05 /
Munz, Guenter Rebenweg 20 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Lemcke, Rupert, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1988/51] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer Bismarckstrasse 16 Postfach 4026 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107908.1 | 18.05.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | DE19873719840 | 13.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3719840 | [1988/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295444 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295444 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295444 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/10, F16L21/02, F16L13/02, F01N7/18 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
F01N13/1811 (EP,US);
F16L27/1021 (EP,US);
F16L39/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/51] | F16L21/02, F16L13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Verbindung zweier Rohre einer Leitung für heisse Medien | [1988/51] | English: | Pipe connection for a hot fluid conduit | [1988/51] | French: | Connexion de deux tuyaux d'une conduite pour fluides chauds | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.02.1992 | FR | 26.02.1992 | GB | 26.02.1992 | IT | 26.02.1992 | SE | 26.02.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 26.02.1992 | |
GB | 26.02.1992 | ||
IT | 26.02.1992 | ||
SE | 26.02.1992 | ||
FR | 17.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 26.02.1992 | |
IT | 26.02.1992 | ||
SE | 26.02.1992 | ||
FR | 17.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | GB | 26.02.1992 | |
SE | 26.02.1992 | ||
FR | 17.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | SE | 26.02.1992 | |
FR | 17.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | SE | 26.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1894094 (HACKETT HAROLD N); | [Y]DE2222355 ; | [YD]DE3527213 (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]); | [A]EP0208128 |