EP0296360 - Folding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loebach, Michael H. R.D. No. 3 Box 93 Fort Plain New York 13339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states Loebach, Michael H. R.D. No. 3 Box 93 Fort Plain New York 13339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Goetz, Rupert, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88107957.8 | 18.05.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | US19870054389 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: US 54389 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296360 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296360 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296360 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/12, B65H45/04 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
B41F13/60 (EP,US);
B65H45/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/52] | B65H45/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Falzapparat | [1988/52] | English: | Folding apparatus | [1988/52] | French: | Appareil de pliage | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.02.1993 | IT | 24.02.1993 | LI | 24.02.1993 | SE | 24.02.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/38] | CH | 24.02.1993 | |
LI | 24.02.1993 | ||
SE | 24.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 24.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1411773 (WINKLER FALLERT & CO MASCHF) |