EP0293695 - Alloy powder mixture for treating alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrigno, Stephen Joseph 1504 Forester Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45240 / US | 02 /
Somerville, Mark (NMN) 1731 Minion Street Cincinnati Ohio 45205 / US | 03 /
Young, William Rollin 4628 Fiels-Ertel Road Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | CATHERINE, Alain Bureau D.A. CASALONGA-JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/49] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88108115.2 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870056175 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: US 56175 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293695 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293695 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/30, C23C4/06, C23C10/30, C22C19/05, C22C19/07, B23P6/04 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B23K35/304 (EP,US);
B23K35/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12861 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Legierungspulvergemisch zur Behandlung von Legierungen | [1988/49] | English: | Alloy powder mixture for treating alloys | [1988/49] | French: | Mélange de poudre d'alliage pour le traitement d'alliages | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.08.1993 | ES | 11.08.1993 | IT | 11.08.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 11.08.1993 | |
IT | 11.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 11.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0009881 [ ] (CABOT STELLITE EUROP [GB]); | US4285459 [ ] (BALADJANIAN GREGOR, et al); | EP0075497 [ ] (SNECMA [FR]); | CH648357 [ ] (CASTOLIN SA); | EP0165104 [ ] (SNECMA [FR]); | EP0186046 [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) |